Barrese, Carol Anne (CPSO#: 56722)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1230 North Shore Blvd
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone: (905) 336-4135
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

115 Delhi St
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Canada
Phone: (519) 837-6440 Ext. 2218
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.A. Barrese Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Barrese ( CPSO# 56722 )

Business Address:
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone Number: (905) 336-4135

Business Address:
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 336-4135

Business Address:
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 837-6440

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROL ANNE BARRESE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARRESE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1988