Barrett, Aideen Christine (CPSO#: 85911)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University College, Cork, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2007 to 25 Apr 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 26 Apr 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Mar 2008
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2008