Barrett, Catherine Ann (CPSO#: 95849)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
1807 Wonderland Road North
London ON  N6G 5C2
Phone: (519) 433-4330
Fax: (519) 433-4332
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Trevail & C. Barrett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Trevail ( CPSO# 95841 )
Dr. C. Barrett ( CPSO# 95849 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
1807 Wonderland Road North
London ON  N6G 5C2
Phone Number: (519) 433-4330

Business Address:
Happy Valley Family Health Team
268 Maiden Lane
St Marys ON  N4X 1B7
Phone Number: (519) 284-3450

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE ANN BARRETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARRETT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2016