Barrett, Elizabeth Ada (CPSO#: 56931)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Algoma District Medical Group
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone: (705) 759-5623
Fax: (705) 541-2228
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fera Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jenkins ( CPSO# 99889 )
Dr. W. Chung ( CPSO# 99567 )
Dr. R. Tull ( CPSO# 93890 )
Dr. W. Wallace ( CPSO# 92960 )
Dr. J. Bishop ( CPSO# 96910 )
Dr. J. DellaVedova ( CPSO# 91071 )
Dr. J. DellaVedova ( CPSO# 91071 )
Dr. J. Patterson ( CPSO# 91088 )
Dr. A. Schamp ( CPSO# 82979 )
Dr. E. Hirvi ( CPSO# 84322 )
Dr. C. Kuntz ( CPSO# 84476 )
Dr. K. Opryszczko ( CPSO# 89989 )
Dr. J. Keuhl ( CPSO# 88070 )
Dr. M. Hemy ( CPSO# 86777 )
Dr. P. Ciaschini ( CPSO# 52948 )
Dr. P. Catania ( CPSO# 31907 )
Dr. C. Bruni ( CPSO# 55651 )
Dr. S. Buehner ( CPSO# 65582 )
Dr. D. Burrows ( CPSO# 50233 )
Dr. D. Brooks ( CPSO# 26921 )
Dr. P. Bragaglia ( CPSO# 33769 )
Dr. S. Bondar ( CPSO# 59698 )
Dr. E. Beduhn ( CPSO# 26647 )
Dr. D. Beck ( CPSO# 50245 )
Dr. E. Barrett ( CPSO# 56931 )
Dr. S. Allen ( CPSO# 73014 )
Dr. M. Edwards ( CPSO# 52889 )
Dr. A. Fam ( CPSO# 62586 )
Dr. D. Fera ( CPSO# 33299 )
Dr. D. Fritz ( CPSO# 60812 )
Dr. S. Fratesi ( CPSO# 27368 )
Dr. R. Gieni ( CPSO# 67230 )
Dr. M. Hackett ( CPSO# 33820 )
Dr. H. Gupta ( CPSO# 78301 )
Dr. M. Keating ( CPSO# 57489 )
Dr. C. Kobelka ( CPSO# 62567 )
Dr. J. Lane ( CPSO# 61549 )
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 62320 )
Dr. M. Leahy ( CPSO# 57088 )
Dr. M. Mathew ( CPSO# 44024 )
Dr. D. Micomonaco ( CPSO# 80815 )
Dr. M. Mogharrabi ( CPSO# 57473 )
Dr. B. Mitchell ( CPSO# 59931 )
Dr. J. Reich ( CPSO# 73103 )
Dr. C. Rossi ( CPSO# 51523 )
Dr. B. Slagel ( CPSO# 79472 )
Dr. J. Stewart ( CPSO# 72520 )
Dr. K. Taylor ( CPSO# 75094 )
Dr. R. Wytsma ( CPSO# 52032 )
Dr. G. Yee ( CPSO# 70560 )
Dr. K. Zufelt ( CPSO# 67007 )
Dr. P. Zehr ( CPSO# 59997 )
Dr. L. Bonder ( CPSO# 90576 )

Business Address:
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
170 East Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 3C6
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone Number: (705) 549-5540

Business Address:
974 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C2
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
773 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 5K7
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540


Corporation Name: Elizabeth Barrett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Barrett ( CPSO# 56931 )

Business Address:
Algoma District Medical Group
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 541-2681

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 29 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ADA BARRETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARRETT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2004 to 12 Jan 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2005 to 12 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2006 to 12 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 07 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1987