Barrett, Jeffrey Robert (CPSO#: 72385)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jan 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
369 Mary Street
Wiarton ON  N0H 2T0
Phone: (519) 534-5220
Fax: (519) 534-1024
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeffrey Barrett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 14 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Barrett ( CPSO# 72385 )

Business Address:
369 Mary Street
Wiarton ON  N0H 2T0
Phone Number: (519) 534-5220

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton
Grey Bruce Health Services,Wiarton Site Wiarton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY ROBERT BARRETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARRETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2001