Barrett, Rachel Allison (CPSO#: 104877)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4800 Leslie St
Suite 310
North York ON  M2J 2K9
Phone: (416) 492-5888
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RACHEL ALLISON BARRETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARRETT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 22 Sep 2014 to 17 Oct 2014
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Critical Care

McMaster University, 09 Nov 2015 to 04 Dec 2015
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 11 Jan 2016 to 05 Feb 2016
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 10 Apr 2017 to 05 May 2017
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Feb 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 May 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2017