Barrette, Ian (CPSO#: 66823)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Sep 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Sep 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Forces Base Health
Services Centre - Ottawa
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K6
Phone: (613) 945-1549
Fax: (613) 945-1555
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

CISSSO - Pavillon de Hull
Emergency Department
116 Boul Lionel Emond
Gatineau QC  J8Y 1W7
Canada
Phone: (819) 966-6200 Ext. 5151
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN BARRETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARRETTE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1995