Barrientos, Lorena (CPSO#: 78347)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Aug 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Concepcion, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rosedale Medical Centre
Unit 212
600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Phone: (416) 546-3487
Fax: (416) 546-3657
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lorena Barrientos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Barrientos ( CPSO# 78347 )

Business Address:
Rosedale Medical Centre
Unit 212
600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Phone Number: (416) 546-3487

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORENA BARRIENTOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARRIENTOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2002 to 31 Aug 2002
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2003