Barron, Alexander Charles (CPSO#: 67875)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Just For Kids Clinic
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6611
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Emergency Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-5807
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDER CHARLES BARRON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARRON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998