Barron, Philip Thomson (CPSO#: 21599)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Aug 1968

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 09 Aug 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 207
267 O'Connor Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 1V3
Phone: (613) 567-8000
Fax: (613) 567-8022
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2948 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8T5
Canada
Phone: (613) 482-0118
Fax: (613) 680-6420
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Philip Thomson Barron Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Barron ( CPSO# 21599 )

Business Address:
2948 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8T5
Phone Number: (613) 482-0118

Business Address:
207 - 267 O'Connor Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 1V3
Phone Number: (613) 567-8000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1968
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 09 Aug 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 09 Aug 2010 Active View Details [+]
            As  from  August  9,  2010,  the  following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation  on  the certificate of registration  held  by  Dr.  Philip  Thomson
            Barron, in accordance  with  an  undertaking and consent given by Dr. Barron to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr.  Barron  is practising pursuant  to  a  voluntary  undertaking  which
                  restricts his  practice  of  medicine to consultations in relation to the
                  potential for and to the performance  of  minor surgical procedures under
                  local anaesthetic and to consultations in relation  to  the potential for
                  and to the performance of upper and lower endoscopies.  Patients for whom
                  Dr.  Barron performs consultations will be referred for further  surgical
                  or other  consultations  as are appropriate, if his assessment is that he
                  will not perform minor surgical  procedures  under  local  anaesthetic or
                  upper and lower endoscopies for such patients.