Barron-Klauninger, Kathryn (CPSO#: 57072)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1582 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 7Z5
Phone: (613) 731-6620
Fax: (613) 731-6622
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

150 Katimavik Road
Kanata ON  K2L 4N2
Canada
Phone: (613) 482-0118
Fax: (613) 680-6420
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHRYN BARRON-KLAUNINGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARRON-KLAUNINGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1988