Barry, Caroline Rita (CPSO#: 105743)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 27 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 24 Jul 2015
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 2015