Barry, Deborah Ann Douglas (CPSO#: 70182)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 23 Dec 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Dec 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Dec 1997