Barry, Mazin Adnan M (CPSO#: 78971)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 01 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 May 2003 to 31 Jul 2003
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2003 to 31 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2004 to 31 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2005 to 31 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 05 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 06 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 14 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 15 Dec 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 May 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2010