Barsoum, Milad Kamal (CPSO#: 26259)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Cairo, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Tel: 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1
Date Received: 22 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 05 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1973
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015