Barsoum, Nabila Joseph (CPSO#: 27959)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Nov 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Nov 1975

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 WILSON AVENUE
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242 1000 Ext. 62025
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  May 14, 2012
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On June 18, 2012, York Central Hospital notified the College that Dr. Nabila J. Barsoum's privileges were restricted, effective May 14, 2012.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 31 Mar 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NABILA JOSEPH BARSOUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARSOUM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Dec 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 1975