Bartels, Susan Andrea (CPSO#: 74733)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: Payne, Susan Andrea (used until: 02 Sep 2002 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queens University
Department Of Emergency Medicine
Victory 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 4V7
Phone: (613) 548-2368
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan Bartels Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bartels ( CPSO# 74733 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Emergency Medicine
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Queens University
Department of Emergency Medicine
Empire 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 4V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-2368

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN ANDREA BARTELS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARTELS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2014