Barth, David (CPSO#: 70329)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
11E 410
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4914
Fax: (416) 340-5543
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Gutzin and D. Barth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gutzin ( CPSO# 71327 )
Dr. D. Barth ( CPSO# 70329 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
11E 410
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4914

Business Address:
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2000

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 25 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Hematological Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID BARTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARTH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000