Bartleman, Anne-Pascale F (CPSO#: 87179)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Smith Falls Community Health Centre
2 Gould Street
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2S5
Phone: (613) 283-1952
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE-PASCALE F BARTLEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARTLEMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 May 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011