Bartleman, Betty Patricia (CPSO#: 60441)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 20 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 1997