Bartol, Stephen William (CPSO#: 52465)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Nov 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Nov 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 178
2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone: (519) 946-1256
Fax: (519) 253-9967
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Bartol Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 04 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bartol ( CPSO# 52465 )

Business Address:
Suite 178
2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8L 5L7
Phone Number: (519) 946-1256

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN WILLIAM BARTOL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARTOL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Aug 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 1991