Bartolucci, Giampiero (CPSO#: 41976)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Oct 1973

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 09 Mar 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Rome, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Health Centre
Mental Health Outpatient Program
710 Victoria Avenue East
Thunder Bay ON  P7C 5P7
Phone: (807) 624-3400
Fax: (807) 624-3740
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Giampiero Bartolucci Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Bartolucci ( CPSO# 41976 )

Business Address:
2nd Floor
438 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L9A 1C2
Phone Number: (905) 540-1308

Business Address:
710 Victoria Avenue East
Thunder Bay ON  P7C 5P7
Phone Number: (807) 624-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Lakehead Psychiatric Hospital Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 02 Dec 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 1987
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2007
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 04 Sep 2007

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 04 Sep 2007 Active View Details [+]
            Effective September 4, 2007, Dr. Giampiero Bartolucci consents to the following
            terms,  conditions  and  limitations  to  be  imposed  on  his  certificate  of
            registration  pursuant  to  an  Undertaking  he  has  given  to  the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

            *     Effective from September 4, 2007 to November 30, 2007:

                  That  Dr. Bartolucci may only prescribe narcotics, controlled  drugs  and
                  substances  as  defined in Schedules I and II of the Controlled Drugs and
                  Substances Act if  another  physician  acceptable  to the College has co-
                  signed the prescription.
                  
            *     Effective from December 1, 2007 forward:

                  Dr.  Bartolucci  has voluntarily relinquished his prescribing  privileges
                  with  respect to all  drugs,  substances  and  preparations  set  out  in
                  Schedules I and II of the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C. 1996,
                  c. 19,  as amended, and related regulations, with the exception of verbal
                  prescription narcotics.  These are summarized as follows:
                  
            Drug/Substance               Relinquished         Not Relinquished

            Narcotic Drugs                        X

            Narcotic Preparations                 Written                Verbal

            Controlled Drugs                                                    X

            Benzodiazepines / 
            Other Targeted Substances                                     X