Barton, Colin Sinclair (CPSO#: 23997)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Aug 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1998