Barton, Pamela Margaret (CPSO#: 53567)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Aug 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 04 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Aug 2000