Bartosik, Lidia Maria (CPSO#: 58643)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Dec 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Cracow, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7628
Fax: (905) 848-0328
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1421 Hurontario Str.
Mississauga ON  L5G 3H5
Canada
Phone: (905) 278-7077
Fax: (905) 278-1582
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lidia Bartosik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bartosik ( CPSO# 58643 )

Business Address:
150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  L5G 3H5
Phone Number: (416) 521-4011

Business Address:
1421 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5G 3H5
Phone Number: (905) 278-7077

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 484-7628

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 05 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIDIA MARIA BARTOSIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARTOSIK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 1990