Bartram, Jack Luke (CPSO#: 111814)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 May 2017

Expiry Date:  25 Apr 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 15 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sheffield, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Haematology/Oncology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACK LUKE BARTRAM may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. BARTRAM is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. BARTRAM shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BARTRAM is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BARTRAM shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. BARTRAM ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. BARTRAM ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 25 Apr 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 May 2017 to 14 Jul 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 15 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 May 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2017