Barwin, Bernard Norman (CPSO#: 28666)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Aug 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Accuro Health Services 18-700 Industrial Avenue Ottawa, ON K1G 0Y9 Telephone: 613-738-1242 Fax: 613-738-0562 Website: http://www.accuro.ca
Date Received: 02 Sep 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2012
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 31 Jan 2013
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 31 Mar 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Aug 2014

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 31 Jan 2013
Summary:

On January 31, 2013, the Disciplined Committee found that Dr. Bernard Norman Barwin 
committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has failed to maintain the standard of 
practice of the profession. Dr. Barwin admitted the allegation.  
 
Dr. Barwin is a general practitioner with additional training in obstetrics and gynaecology. He 
has practised in Ontario in artificial insemination, among other areas of medicine since 1973.  
 
Patient A became pregnant in 2004 as a result of artificial insemination conducted by Dr. Barwin. 
Approximately three years later, Patient A found out, through DNA testing, that her child was not 
the product of the donor sperm she had instructed Dr. Barwin to use to inseminate her. 
 
In or about late 2006/early 2007, Patient B went to Dr. Barwin with her sister, Patient C, who had 
agreed to act as Patient B's surrogate.  Dr. Barwin was to artificially inseminate Patient C with 
the sperm of Patient B's husband. Patient C discovered, through DNA testing in 2008, that her 
child was not the biological child of Patient B's husband.  
 
In or about 1985 and 1986, Patient D went to Dr. Barwin for the purpose of being artificially 
inseminated with her husband's sperm. In approximately 2011, Patient D discovered, through 
DNA testing, that her son was not her husband's biological child. 
 
The errors in the inseminations of Patients A and C occurred after Dr. Barwin had been notified 
by the College of an error he made in his insemination of another patient, Patient E, in 1994.  
Patient E discovered, following the birth of her child in June, 1995, that the child was not the 
product of the donor sperm she had instructed Dr. Barwin to use to inseminate her.  Dr. Barwin 
was notified of this error by the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario and states that he 
took some steps to endeavour to ensure that no such errors would occur in his practice in the 
future. 
 
Dr.  Barwin and an expert review were unable to identify any evident errors in the conduct of the 
artificial inseminations or in Dr. Barwin's office policies and procedures regarding his artificial 
insemination practice. However, Dr. Barwin accepts that errors in his practice, which would fall 
below the standard of care, resulted in his failure to provide his patients with offspring from their 
intended biological fathers. These concerns do not involve any other areas of Dr. Barwin's 
medical practice. 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
      the Registrar suspend Dr. Barwin's certificate of registration for a period of two (2) 
      months commencing immediately. 
      Dr. Barwin attend before this panel to be reprimanded. 
      Dr. Barwin pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.00 within thirty (30) days of 
      the date of this Order. 
 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): January 31, 2013

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 30, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Barwin resigned from the College effective August 30, 2014 and has agreed never to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.