Barwitzki, Gary Wilhelm (CPSO#: 60922)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bluewater Methadone Clinic
118 Victoria Street North
Sarnia ON  N7T 5W9
Phone: (519) 337-5000
Fax: (519) 337-4406
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bluewater Health
Emergency Department
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Canada
Phone: (519) 464-4500 Ext. 5214
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01

Bluewater Methadone Clinic
1430 Dufferin Ave
Wallaceburg ON  N8A 2W5
Canada
Phone: (519) 627-5800
Fax: (519) 627-5808
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01

Archway
4-1679 London Line
Sarnia ON  N7W 1B1
Canada
Phone: (519) 541-0394
Fax: (519) 541-0936
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01

Bluewater Methadone Clinic
69 Grand Ave East
Chatham ON  N7L 1V8
Canada
Phone: (519) 351-5800
Fax: (519) 351-5899
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gary Barwitzki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Barwitzki ( CPSO# 60922 )

Business Address:
69 Grand Avenue East
Chatham ON  N7L 1V8
Phone Number: (519) 531-5800

Business Address:
1430 Dufferin Avenue
Wallaceburg ON  N8A 2W5
Phone Number: (519) 627-5800

Business Address:
Sport Medicine Clinic
Suite 4
1679 London Line
Sarnia ON  N7W 1B1
Phone Number: (519) 541-0394

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4500

Business Address:
118 Victoria Street North
Sarnia ON  N7T 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 337-5000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Tennessee

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 09 Dec 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GARY WILHELM BARWITZKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARWITZKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1990