Baryla, Julia Grazyna (CPSO#: 84218)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 May 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 May 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 507
595 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone: (613) 741-2020
Fax: (613) 741-5997
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Winchester District
Memorial Hospital
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Canada
Phone: (613) 774-2420
Fax: (613) 774-7206
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

Riverside Hospital
1967 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Canada
Phone: (613) 722-7000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Ong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Baryla ( CPSO# 84218 )
Dr. M. Ong ( CPSO# 82636 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
Box 911
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-7700

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 737-7700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIA GRAZYNA BARYLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARYLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 May 2013