Baryshnik, Devra Bayla (CPSO#: 74718)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 407
531 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 6P5
Phone: (905) 895-6673
Fax: (905) 895-8765
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEVRA BAYLA BARYSHNIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARYSHNIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 26 Nov 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 27 Nov 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2005