Bashour, Mounir (CPSO#: 71629)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:McGill University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lasik MD
300 - 5025 Orbitor Drive
Mississauga ON  L4W 4Y5
Phone: 5149330133
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2235 Sheppard Avenue East
Atria II
North York ON  M2J 5B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 362-8677
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

100 King St W #120
Toronto ON  M5X 2A1
Canada
Phone: (416) 362-8677
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

407 Laurier Avenue West
Store 10/11
Minto Place Atrium
Ottawa ON  K1R 7Y7
Canada
Phone: (613) 288-2020
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

100 Princess St, Kingston
Kingston ON  K7L 1A7
Canada
Phone: (613) 531-3337
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
Nova Scotia
Quebec
USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOUNIR BASHOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASHOUR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1999