Basile, Vincenzo Santo (CPSO#: 80963)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health Hospital
Room 2306
10 Trench Street
Toronto ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (416) 202-6623
Fax: (416) 202-6624
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vincenzo Basile Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Basile ( CPSO# 80963 )

Business Address:
Mackenzie Health Hospital
Room 2306
10 Trench Street
Toronto ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (416) 202-6623

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VINCENZO SANTO BASILE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASILE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2009