Basinski, Antoni Stanislaw Hilferding (CPSO#: 55653)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
160 Beck St
Unit 6
Wasaga Beach ON  L9Z 2K7
Phone: (705) 422-4020
Fax: (705) 422-4021
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Basinski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Basinski ( CPSO# 55653 )

Business Address:
6 - 160 Beck Street
Wasaga Beach ON  L9Z 2K7
Phone Number: (705) 422-4020

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTONI STANISLAW HILFERDING BASINSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASINSKI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1987
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2009