Baskys, Andrius (CPSO#: 64442)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Vilnius State University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 08 Aug 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 09 Aug 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 08 Aug 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Dec 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Aug 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997