Basmadji, Ahmad Sobhi (CPSO#: 52111)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 05 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Aleppo, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 08 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist
General Pathology Effective: 10 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Jul 1993