Basmaji, John (CPSO#: 100827)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Science Centre
Department of Internal Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN BASMAJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASMAJI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2017