Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Basrur, Vasanth Rao (CPSO#: 18530)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Feb 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Feb 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Kannada, Konkani

Education:University of Toronto, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vasanth Basrur Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 6 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 11 Mar 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Feb 2015