Bass, Juan (CPSO#: 50119)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Apr 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Apr 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:Colegio Mayor De Ntra Sra Del Rosario, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital Of
Eastern Ontario
Department Of Surgery
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2060
Fax: (613) 738-4849
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Juan Bass Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bass ( CPSO# 50119 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric General Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUAN BASS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 1987