Bassel, Shauna (CPSO#: 106742)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Campus
Department of Family Medicine
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 562-6335
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAUNA BASSEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASSEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2017