Bassett, Anne Susan (CPSO#: 50120)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Clinical Genetics Research Program
Centre for Addiction
and Mental Health
33 Russell Street
Toronto ON  M5S 2S1
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 32731
Fax: (416) 535-7199
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
8NU - Room 802
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
Phone: (416) 340-5145
Fax: (416) 340-5004
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,- Russell Street Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE SUSAN BASSETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASSETT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1987