Bassilious, Ereny (CPSO#: 82588)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Faculty of Health Sciences
H S C 3A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75702
Fax: (905) 308-7548
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 19 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 28 Feb 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERENY BASSILIOUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASSILIOUS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 19 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 20 Oct 2008 to 19 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 20 Oct 2009 to 19 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 20 Oct 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2010