Bassoon, Felix (CPSO#: 55241)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Dec 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
Wilson Site
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242 1000 Ext. 48000
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 06 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FELIX BASSOON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASSOON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1986