Bassuni, Wafaa Y S (CPSO#: 85758)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 07 Nov 2006 to 30 Jan 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Transfusion Medicine

McMaster University, 31 Jan 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
Clinical Fellow - Transfusion Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2007