Basta, Magdy Nazeer (CPSO#: 69493)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Asyut University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997