Basta, Mourad Mounir (CPSO#: 61847)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Oct 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
3029 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2B 8E8
Phone: (613) 726-1839
Fax: (613) 726-9733
Electoral District: 07

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd 1 High Meadow Place North York ON M9L 0A3 1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 12 Jan 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOURAD MOUNIR BASTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASTA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Feb 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1991