Basur, Roshan Lal (CPSO#: 68317)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1994

Indicates a concern or additional information


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kashmir University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2285 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V2
Phone: (519) 254-7979
Fax: (519) 254-0488
Electoral District: 01

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients should write to: Suite 102 2425 Tecumseh Road East Windsor ON N8W 1E6
Date Received: 27 Mar 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. ROSHAN LAL BASUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASUR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1994


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 29, 2016
Expiry Date:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)