Batay-Csorba, Thomas (CPSO#: 26482)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 May 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 May 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 14 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 May 2007