Batchra, Nandita (CPSO#: 66713)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jan 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jan 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 5
1435 Plains Road East
Burlington ON  L7R 3P9
Phone: (905) 681-3663
Fax: (905) 681-4510
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. Batchra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Batchra ( CPSO# 66713 )

Business Address:
5 - 1435 Plains Road East
Burlington ON  L7R 3P9
Phone Number: (905) 681-3663

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 17 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NANDITA BATCHRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BATCHRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2002