Bates, Carol Eleanor (CPSO#: 56723)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 May 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
York Medical
Unit 2
181 Green Lane East
East Gwillimbury ON  L9N 0C9
Phone: (905) 868-9243
Fax: (905) 836-1597
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carol E. Bates Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Bates ( CPSO# 56723 )

Business Address:
York Medical
Unit 2
181 Green Lane East
East Gwillimbury ON  L9N 0C9
Phone Number: (905) 868-9243

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROL ELEANOR BATES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BATES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1988