Bates, Kenneth Stephen (CPSO#: 50121)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
221 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON  N3T 3J2
Phone: (519) 753-8666
Fax: (519) 753-3109
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Downie, Thompson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 10 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Roye ( CPSO# 61763 )
Dr. D. Lowcock ( CPSO# 30284 )
Dr. D. Downie ( CPSO# 64176 )
Dr. K. Bates ( CPSO# 50121 )
Dr. C. Cowan ( CPSO# 60712 )
Dr. D. Thompson ( CPSO# 54979 )

Business Address:
Avenue Medical Centre
221 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON  N3T 3J2
Phone Number: (519) 753-8666


Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Bates Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 15 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Bates ( CPSO# 50121 )

Business Address:
221 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON  N3T 3J2
Phone Number: (519) 752-0970

Business Address:
105 - 216 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1S8
Phone Number: (519) 428-0432

Business Address:
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5523

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 05 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH STEPHEN BATES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BATES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1984